.Ionut
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
Faction logs
Date | Leader | Faction | Action | Reason | |
20.09.2023 17:43 | El Loco Cartel | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
19.09.2023 18:51 | El Loco Cartel | Got rank 2 | Felicitări, Ionut! | ||
05.09.2023 00:23 | El Loco Cartel | Joined the faction | None | ||
24.04.2023 21:13 | The Tsar Bratva | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
09.04.2023 21:14 | The Tsar Bratva | Received FactionWarn | absent 2/2 wars 07.04.2023 | ||
24.03.2023 22:42 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 4 | Felicitari! | ||
11.03.2023 15:16 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 3 | Renuntare | ||
07.03.2023 16:05 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 6 | Felicitari. Noul Sublider! | ||
21.02.2023 19:35 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 3 | Felicitari, meriti! | ||
28.01.2023 23:00 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 2 | Felicitari, meriti! | ||
14.01.2023 22:47 | The Tsar Bratva | Joined the faction | None | ||
14.01.2023 19:52 | Vietnamese Boys | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
13.01.2023 23:10 | Vietnamese Boys | Received FactionWarn | Fast C-bug la war | ||
31.12.2022 16:37 | Vietnamese Boys | Joined the faction | None | ||
31.12.2022 15:07 | 69 Pier Mobs | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation |