Kevin.JR
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
Faction
Faction member of | Civilian |
Join date | No information available |
Rank | None |
Faction warnings | 0/3 |
Faction punish | 0/60 |
Time in faction | 0 day(s) |
Top 5 Faction ranks
Date | Faction | Rank |
01.01.2017 23:25 | Green Street Bloods | Got rank 4 |
18.11.2016 22:48 | Green Street Bloods | Got rank 3 |
10.05.2015 15:35 | SF Taxi | Got rank 3 |
26.04.2015 12:59 | SF Taxi | Got rank 2 |
16.02.2015 19:47 | LV School Instructors | Got rank 2 |
Latest Faction applications
Date | Faction | Status | View |
01.10.2016 20:26 | Green Street Bloods | Invitat / Invited | View |
12.04.2015 15:36 | SF Taxi | Invitat / Invited | View |
31.01.2015 13:43 | LV School Instructors | Invitat / Invited | View |
Latest Faction resignations
Date | Faction | Rank | Status | View |
01.03.2017 10:44 | Green Street Bloods | Chief Enforcer (4) | Acceptata / Accepted (0 FP) | View |
Latest Faction inactivities
Date | Faction | Status | View |
09.02.2017 17:01 | Green Street Bloods | Acceptata / Accepted | View |
09.11.2016 17:52 | Green Street Bloods | Acceptata / Accepted | View |
Latest Faction Absences
Date | Faction | Status | View |
Latest Faction logs
Date | Leader | Faction | Action | Reason | |
01.03.2017 14:28 | Green Street Bloods | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
28.02.2017 22:30 | Green Street Bloods | Received FactionWarn | Absent waruri ( 28.02.2017 ) | ||
01.01.2017 23:25 | Green Street Bloods | Got rank 4 | Vechime necesara | ||
18.11.2016 22:48 | Green Street Bloods | Got rank 3 | Vechime necesara | ||
18.10.2016 01:15 | Green Street Bloods | Got rank 2 | Timpul necesar, merita. | ||
02.10.2016 13:41 | Green Street Bloods | Joined the faction | None | ||
16.05.2015 01:12 | N/A | SF Taxi | Left the faction | None | |
10.05.2015 15:35 | N/A | SF Taxi | Got rank 3 | None | |
26.04.2015 12:59 | N/A | SF Taxi | Got rank 2 | None | |
13.04.2015 15:16 | N/A | SF Taxi | Joined the faction | None | |
24.03.2015 20:11 | N/A | LV School Instructors | Left the faction | None | |
16.02.2015 19:47 | N/A | LV School Instructors | Got rank 2 | None | |
31.01.2015 20:35 | N/A | LV School Instructors | Joined the faction | None |