rpg2_Cristy.ZEW
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
Faction logs
Date | Leader | Faction | Action | Reason | |
07.09.2019 10:49 | Avispa Rifa | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
20.08.2019 18:59 | Avispa Rifa | Got rank 3 | Renuntare | ||
06.08.2019 14:33 | Avispa Rifa | Got rank 6 | Felicitari ! | ||
30.07.2019 20:46 | Avispa Rifa | Got rank 3 | Felicitari ! | ||
09.07.2019 03:22 | Avispa Rifa | Got rank 2 | Felicitari ! | ||
24.06.2019 19:29 | Avispa Rifa | Joined the faction | None | ||
22.06.2019 16:13 | 69 Pier Mobs | Was kicked out (with FP) | Demisie / Resignation | ||
22.06.2019 12:43 | 69 Pier Mobs | Got rank 1 | Schimbare Sub-Lider. | ||
17.06.2019 12:26 | 69 Pier Mobs | Got rank 6 | Felicitari#ZEW | ||
17.06.2019 12:26 | 69 Pier Mobs | Joined the faction | None | ||
14.06.2019 20:16 | El Loco Cartel | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
31.05.2019 18:23 | El Loco Cartel | Joined the faction | None | ||
10.04.2019 21:32 | N/A | 69 Pier Mobs | Was kicked out (with FP) | Inactive and Banned | |
06.04.2019 13:59 | 69 Pier Mobs | Joined the faction | None | ||
19.02.2019 22:19 | 69 Pier Mobs | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation |