KeNt1.0
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
- arrow_drop_down
Faction logs
Date | Leader | Faction | Action | Reason | |
22.02.2019 18:27 | Vietnamese Boys | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
16.02.2019 14:34 | Vietnamese Boys | Got rank 2 | Felicitari! | ||
27.01.2019 21:49 | Vietnamese Boys | Joined the faction | None | ||
18.11.2018 21:03 | The Tsar Bratva | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
17.11.2018 17:35 | The Tsar Bratva | Got rank 2 | Felicitari #ak47 | ||
03.11.2018 12:11 | The Tsar Bratva | Joined the faction | None | ||
01.11.2018 23:43 | LS Taxi | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
21.10.2018 13:44 | LS Taxi | Got rank 2 | Felicitari! | ||
06.10.2018 17:40 | LS Taxi | Joined the faction | None | ||
22.09.2018 07:04 | LV Taxi | Left the faction | Demisie / Resignation | ||
07.09.2018 12:49 | LV Taxi | Joined the faction | None |